Case Information: 80-PR-1144 | |||
Short Caption: | IN RE ESTATE OF ETHEL D. STARR; JOYCE SARGEANT, APLT | Classification: | Appeals - Probate - Probate |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | ADMN971-78 | Filed Date: | 09/26/1980 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 09/26/1980 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | 10/17/1980 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | 01/16/1981 | ||
Argued/Submitted: | 03/19/1981 | ||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: |
Party Information | |||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||
Appellant | Joyce Sargeant | N |
| ||||||
Appellee | John Doe | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
01/01/1901 | STARR, ETHEL D. IN RE THE ESTATE OF | |||
09/26/1980 | Filed | OPENING EVENT - Opening Event | ||
10/17/1980 | Filed | Record Completed | ||
01/16/1981 | Filed | Briefing Completed | ||
03/19/1981 | Filed | ACTION - Argued / Submitted | ||
01/07/1983 | Filed | OUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition |