judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MICHAEL SARR v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (06-164)
Case Number:06-164Case Docketed On:07/14/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fifth Judicial District Hot Springs CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:MICHAEL SARR v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:MICHAEL SARR, Appellant (Defedant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantMichael SarrD. Terry Rogers
Donna D. Domonkos
Ryan R. Roden
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Daniel Michael Fetsco

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 140
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
07/14/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
07/14/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
07/14/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
08/30/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
09/01/2006Order - Grant - extension of time - brief of appellantOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
10/13/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
10/16/2006Order - Grant - extension of time - brief of appellantOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
11/30/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
01/02/2007Brief - Anders -BriefAndersFinal
01/03/2007Motion - Withdrawal of counsel - Ryan RodenMotionWithdrawal of counselFinal
01/16/2007Order - Deny - permission for court-appointed counsel to withdraw and order requiring the Public Defender to file brief addressing the merits.OrderDenyFinal
02/20/2007Brief - Appellant; received copy of brief on disk and designation of record on appeal.BriefAppellantFinal
04/05/2007Brief - Appellee; received ocpy of brief on disk and designation of record on appeal.BriefAppelleeFinal
04/12/2007Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
04/23/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
04/25/2007Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
04/27/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, two volumes. Volume I, original papers; volume II, transcripts.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
04/27/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
08/29/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming and remanding for further proceedings, Justice Kite writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
08/31/2007Service - Certified mail signature return card (Warden)ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
09/14/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
09/14/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
09/14/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
09/19/2007Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal