judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 3rd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 03-94-00084-CV
03-94-00084-CV
02/18/1994
Summary judgment
C. W. Alcorn, Jr.
AmWest Savings Association, formerly known as Olney Savings and Loan Association, formerly known as NuOlney, as Assignee of the Federal Savings and Loan Insurance Corporation, Receiver for San Angelo Savings Association
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/25/2003Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
01/23/1996CASE STORED
08/05/1994Mandate Issued
06/01/1994Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/01/1994Opinion issuedDismissed
05/03/1994Motion for Dismissal Filed
04/19/1994Response requested (postcard)
03/31/1994miscellaneous motion dispMotion or Writ Granted
03/28/1994Letter received
03/25/1994Response to Motion
03/16/1994Response requested (postcard)
03/11/1994miscellaneous motion filed
03/09/1994Notice received
03/02/1994Response requested (postcard)
02/18/1994Transcript Filed
02/18/1994Transcript Received
02/18/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/05/1994Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Alcorn, Jr., C. W.AppellantMr. Stephen W. Sather
Amwest Savings AssociationAppellee
Carpenter, James R.Interested partyMr. James R. Carpenter
Amwest Savings Association, FoAppelleeMr. Roy Kemp Kasling
Perkinson, Doyle E.Interested partyMr. Doyle E. Perkinson
Mc Call, Caddy S.Interested partyMr. Caddy S. Mccall
Trial Court Information
126th District Court
Travis
Honorable John K. Dietz
486,710