judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

H & S Financial v. Ingrid Albrecht

Case: 05-94-00252-CV
05-94-00252-CV
02/18/1994
Contract
H & S Financial
Ingrid Albrecht
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event Type Description Document
No briefs.
Case Events
Date Event Type Disposition Document
03/16/1994Case transferred from this court to another court of appealsCase Transferred to Another Court of Appeals
03/16/1994Case transferred from this court to another court of appealsCase Transferred to Another Court of Appeals
02/18/1994Transcript Filed
02/18/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
01/27/1994Appeal Bond Filed
10/29/1993Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/22/1994Case StoredCase archived
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No. 4
Dallas
CC92-10888-D