judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-3149
A-3149
04/16/1951
Application for Writ of Error
CITY OF EL PASO
PAN AMERICAN SUPPLY COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/18/1951Motion for RehearingPetitioner
04/30/1951Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
04/26/1951Response to PetitionRespondent
04/16/1951Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/23/1951Response to Motion filed
05/18/1951Motion for RehearingOverruled
04/30/1951Brief in Support of Petition
04/26/1951Response to Petition
04/16/1951Application for Writ of Error - Filed
04/16/1951Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Pan American Supply CompanyRespondent
City of El PasoPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information