judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

TIBESAR CONSTRUCTION VS. CLARK CO. SCHOOL DIST.

Case Information: 38937
Short Caption:TIBESAR CONSTRUCTION VS. CLARK CO. SCHOOL DIST.Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A440065Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:01/10/2002 / Reed, NathanielSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/18/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Schreck Brignone - check no. 021969.
12/18/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-21288
01/04/2002Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Thomas J. Tanksley. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
01/04/2002Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 02-00240
01/10/2002Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Settlement Judge Reassignment. New Settlement Judge: Nathaniel J. Reed.
01/17/2002Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. 02-01254
01/25/2002Notice/Outgoing Letter. Nathaniel J. Reed. (Amended Notice of Appeal)
01/28/2002Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Transmit Required Document. Judgment filed 12/13/01. Due Date: 10 days
01/29/2002Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
01/29/2002Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Cross-Appeal. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for cross-appellant.) 02-01921
02/04/2002Notice/Outgoing Letter. Nathaniel J. Reed. (Cross-Appeal)
02/04/2002Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Certified copy of Stipulation and Order to Dismiss filed in district court on December 13, 2001. 02-02285
02/04/2002Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Certified copy of Notice of Entry of Stipulation and Order to Dismiss filed in district court on December 18, 2001. 02-02286
02/06/2002Notice/Outgoing Letter. Nathaniel J. Reed. (district court order filed December 13, 2001)
02/11/2002Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: March 6, 2002. 02-02694
03/11/2002Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: April 5, 2002. 02-04391
03/29/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order. To date, respondents/cross-appellants have failed to file the docketing statement. Respondents/cross-appellants shall, within 10 days of the date of this order, file and serve the docketing statement. 02-05598
04/08/2002Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. Respondent/Cross-Appellant. 02-06123
04/12/2002Notice/Outgoing Letter. Nathaniel J. Reed. (Docketing statement of respondent/cross-appellant)
04/12/2002Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: April 26, 2002. 02-06585
04/29/2002Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 02-07526
05/13/2002Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. We reinstate the time deadlines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs. Appellant/cross-respondent and respondents/cross-appellants each: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a). Appellant/cross-respondent: 120 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Respondents/cross-appellants: 30 days thereafter to file and serve a combined answering brief on appeal and opening brief on cross-appeal. Appellant/cross-respondent: 30 days thereafter to file a combined reply brief on appeal and answering brief on cross-appeal. Respondents/cross-appellants: 30 days thereafter to file and serve a reply brief on cross-appeal. 02-08290
05/29/2002Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 10/22/01, 12/17/01, 12/21/01. To Court Reporter: Free Lance Court Reporters. Requested by Respondents/Cross-Appellants. 02-09354
05/29/2002Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 9/28/01. To Court Reporter: Kris Johnson Moore. Submitted by Respondents/ Cross-Appellants. 02-09355
05/31/2002Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. Submitted by Appellant/Cross-Respondent. 02-09546
06/13/2002TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 10/22/01; 12/17/01; and 12/21/01. Court Reporter: Court Reporters: Jo A. Scott and Cindy Magnuseen. 02-10289
08/12/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On May 29, 2002, appellant filed a transcript request form requesting the production of a transcript for proceedings conducted on September 28, 2001, by court recorder Kris Johnson Moore. This appeal was docketed in this court on December 18, 2001, and therefore appellant improperly requested the transcript conducted on September 28, 2001. If appellant will be citing to this transcript, appellant shall include a filed stamp copy of the transcript in the appendix to the opening brief. 02-13728
08/26/2002TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 9/27/01. Court Reporter: Kris Johnson. 02-14580
09/11/2002MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: September 30, 2002. 02-15697
10/02/2002BriefFiled Opening Brief. Appellant/Cross-Respondent Opening Brief. Mailed on: 09/30/02. 02-17042
10/02/2002AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Appendix. 02-17043
11/05/2002MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Respondent Martin Harris Construction Co. Brief due: December 2, 2002. 02-19069
11/13/2002MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Clark County School District and the Board of School Trustees, Mary Beth Scow, Sheila R. Moulton, Denise Brodsky, Susan C. Brager-Wellman, Ruth L. Johnson, Shirley Barber and Larry P. Mason's Motion for an Extension of Time to File Its Response to Appellant's Opening Brief (First Request). 02-19531
11/26/2002Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. filed November 13, 2002. Respondent/cross-appellants shall have until December 2, 2002, to file and serve a combined answering brief on appeal and opening brief on cross-appeal. Appellant/cross-respondent shall have 30 days from the date of service of respondent's answering brief to file and serve a reply brief. Appellant/cross-respondent shall also have 30 days from the date of service of respondents/cross-appellants' combined answering brief on appeal and opening brief on cross-appeal to file a combined rely brief on appeal and answering brief on cross-appeal. Respondents/cross-appellants shall have 30 days thereafter to file and serve a reply brief on cross-appeal. 02-20346
12/03/2002MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Joint Motion for Continuance of Briefing Schedule and Stipulation. 02-20617
12/12/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed December 3, 2002. Respondents shall have until January 21, 2003, to file and serve their answering briefs. No further extensions of time shall be permitted absent demonstration of extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. 02-21213
01/23/2003MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. (with prejudice). 03-01241
02/13/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On January 23, 2003, the parties filed a stipulation to dismiss this appeal. If the parties desire a dismissal of respondents/cross-appellants' cross-appeal as well, cross-appellant shall have 15 days from the date of this order to file a stipulation or motion to dismiss their cross-appeal or otherwise inform this court of the status of their cross-appeal. Alternatively, the parties shall have 15 days from the date of this order to file an amended stipulation to dismiss both the appeal and cross-appeal. fn1[We defer action on the parties' stipulation to dismiss pending the receipt of a response to this order.] 03-02538
02/26/2003MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. Respondent/Cross-Appellants' Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice. 03-03164
03/05/2003Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal and cross-appeal are dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). SNP/CLK 03-03593
03/05/2003Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.