judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

INOCENCIO RAMOS v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION,

Case Heading (06-100)
Case Number:06-100Case Docketed On:05/04/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Eighth Judicial District Converse CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Labor and Employment (Title 27)
Short Title:INOCENCIO RAMOS v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION,
Full Title:INOCENCIO RAMOS, Appellant (Petitioner), v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION, Appellee (Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantInocencio RamosHampton McCracken Young Jr.
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
John William Renneisen
Steven R. Czoschke
Kristi Marie Radosevich

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 85
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
05/04/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
05/04/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
05/04/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
05/04/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
05/04/2006Order - Sanction - notice of appealOrderSanction - notice of appealFinal
05/30/2006Fees - Sanctions received - NOAFeesSanctions received - NOAFinal
06/13/2006Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
06/15/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
07/11/2006Event - Phone Call from counsel for appellant re faxing brief. Advised we cannot accept a fax filed brief and that the original and six copies are due tomorrow.EventPhone CallFinal
07/12/2006Brief - Appellant; brief not signed by counsel of record, signature illegible.BriefAppellantFinal
08/02/2006Notice-Incoming - Attachment; amended appendixNotice-IncomingAttachmentFinal
08/02/2006Notice-Incoming - Designation of recordNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
08/28/2006Brief - Appellee; received copy of designation of record on appeal and copy of brief on disk.BriefAppelleeFinal
09/15/2006Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
09/15/2006Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
09/21/2006Record - Transmitted record on appeal; two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Agency Record.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
05/22/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding. Justice Golden writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
06/01/2007Motion - Fees and costsMotionFees and costsFinal
06/19/2007Order - Awarding attorney fees and costsOrderAwarding attorney fees and costsFinal
06/19/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
06/19/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
06/19/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
06/21/2007Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal