judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

FLOYD E. DAVIS MORTGAGE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA

Case Information: 80-TX-0511
Short Caption:FLOYD E. DAVIS MORTGAGE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIAClassification:Appeals - Tax - Tax
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:2314Filed Date:05/08/1980

Opening Event Date:05/08/1980Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/23/1980Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/15/1981
Argued/Submitted:11/16/1981
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901FLOYD E. DAVIS MORTGAGE CORPORATION DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
05/08/1980FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
10/23/1980FiledRecord Completed
06/15/1981FiledBriefing Completed
11/16/1981FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
02/11/1983FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition