judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals

Case: 05-94-00261-CR
05-94-00261-CR
02/18/1994
Other Felony
Myers, Larry
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/16/1994Case transferred from this court to another court of appealsCase Transferred to Another Court of Appeals
03/16/1994Case transferred from this court to another court of appealsCase Transferred to Another Court of Appeals
03/10/1994Statement of Facts Filed
02/18/1994Notice Sent
02/18/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
01/20/1994Notice of Appeal Filed
01/06/1994Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/16/1994Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 5
Dallas
F93-67037-L
4 yrs TDC