Case Information: 38927 | |||
Short Caption: | LARSON VS. PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INS. | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 39138 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Carson City - First Judicial District - 0001173A | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 12/21/2001 / Olsen, Philip | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
12/14/2001 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Charles M. Kilpatrick - check no. 6085. | ||
12/14/2001 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 01-21103 | |
12/20/2001 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 01-21458 | |
12/21/2001 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Philip A. Olsen. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.) | ||
12/24/2001 | Notice/Outgoing | Letter. Philip A. Olsen. | ||
02/04/2002 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Association of Counsel. Representing appellant: Lemons, Grundy & Eisenberg, and Robert L. Eisenberg. | 02-02223 | |
02/13/2002 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. | 02-02861 | |
02/22/2002 | Settlement Program Motion/Stipulation | Filed Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. | 02-03422 | |
03/11/2002 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . these appeals are dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). SNP/CLK. Nos. 38927/39138-these cases are not consolidated. | 02-04310 | |
03/11/2002 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |