judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 3rd Court Of Appeals

Case: 03-94-00097-CR
03-94-00097-CR
02/18/1994
Robbery
Brenda Louise Martin
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/11/1996CASE STORED
01/03/1995Mandate Issued
10/26/1994Opinion issuedAffirmed
08/10/1994Submitted
08/10/1994Submission
07/11/1994Brief filed
07/11/1994Case ready to be set
07/11/1994Submission
06/13/1994Brief filed
06/09/1994Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
06/07/1994Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
05/11/1994Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
05/06/1994Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
04/04/1994Statement of Facts Filed
03/28/1994Transcript Filed
02/18/1994Notice of Appeal Filed
02/18/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/03/1995Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
State Prosecuting AttorneyInterested partyThe Honorable Matthew W. Paul
The State Of TexasCriminal - State of TexasThe Honorable Arthur C. "Cappy" Eads
Mr. James T. Russell
Martin, Brenda LouiseAppellantMr. Troy C. Hurley
Court Of Criminal AppealsDistrict or County ClerksThe Honorable Troy C. Bennett Jr.
Trial Court Information
264th District Court
Bell
Honorable Stanton B Pemberton
43,484
20 yrs.