judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 3rd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 03-94-00090-CR
03-94-00090-CR
02/18/1994
Murder
Susan A. Bienek
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/14/1997CASE STORED
12/08/1995Mandate Issued
10/18/1995Opinion issuedAffirmed
09/06/1995Submitted
09/06/1995Submission
08/16/1995Oral argument acknowledged
08/04/1995Oral argument acknowledged
08/01/1995Submission
02/24/1995Case ready to be set
02/24/1995Brief filed
01/18/1995Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
01/18/1995Order EnteredMotion or Writ Granted
01/09/1995Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
12/23/1994Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
12/16/1994Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
11/23/1994Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
11/21/1994Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
11/09/1994Motion for oral argument disposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/03/1994Motion for oral argument filed
10/25/1994Brief filed
10/25/1994Leave to file extension for whatever disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/20/1994Brief received, not filed
10/20/1994Leave to file extension for whatever filed
10/12/1994Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
10/12/1994Order EnteredMotion or Writ Granted
10/03/1994Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
09/01/1994Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
08/29/1994Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
08/01/1994Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
07/27/1994Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
07/07/1994Exhibits filed
07/07/1994Statement of Facts Filed
06/15/1994Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
06/15/1994Order EnteredMotion or Writ Granted
06/06/1994Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
03/07/1994Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
03/04/1994Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
02/25/1994Statement of facts overdue
02/18/1994Transcript Filed
02/18/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/08/1995Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
State Prosecuting AttorneyInterested partyThe Honorable Matthew W. Paul
Bienek, Susan A.AppellantMs. Mary B. Hennessy
Court Of Criminal AppealsInterested partyThe Honorable Troy C. Bennett Jr.
The State Of TexasCriminal - State of TexasThe Honorable Charles D. Penick
Mr. John M. Hawkins
Trial Court Information
21st District Court
Bastrop
Honorable Harold Robert Towslee
7994
9 yrs.