judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 04-94-00085-CR
04-94-00085-CR
02/18/1994
Burglary
Lutich, Parker
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/30/2017Internal memo
11/28/1994Mandate Executed By The Trial Court
11/17/1994Mandate Issued
11/17/1994Mandate Issued
09/30/1994Opinion issuedAffirmed and Reformed
09/30/1994Opinion issuedAffirmed and Reformed
09/14/1994Submitted
09/14/1994Submission
09/14/1994Submitted
09/13/1994Motion f/l/file Supp. Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/09/1994Supplemental Brief Filed
09/09/1994Motion f/l/file Supp. Brief Filed
09/07/1994Brief Filed
08/19/1994No Description Available.
08/04/1994Submission
07/20/1994No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
07/20/1994Mot. EOT t/file Supp. Transcript DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/13/1994Mot. EOT t/file Supp. Transcript Filed
07/05/1994Brief Filed
07/05/1994Case ready to be set
07/05/1994Case ready to be set
06/23/1994Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/20/1994Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
06/15/1994No Description Available.
06/07/1994Response to Motion Filed
06/01/1994Order Entered
05/26/1994Brief Filed
05/26/1994Brief Recd (If in excess of page limit and/or late)
05/26/1994Response to Motion Filed
05/25/1994Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/16/1994Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
05/09/1994Order Entered
04/18/1994No Description Available.
04/18/1994No Description Available.
03/18/1994No Description Available.
02/18/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
02/17/1994Notice of Appeal Filed
02/15/1994Appealable Order signed in Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/30/2017Case StoredCase archived
11/17/2019RetentionDate criminal case will be destroyed (25 years after mandate)
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Texas, The State OfCriminal - State of TexasAngela J. Moore
Lutich, ParkerCriminal - AppellantAlex J. Scharff
Trial Court Information
144th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Susan D. Reed
88-CR-4628