judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 3rd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 03-94-00103-CR
03-94-00103-CR
02/18/1994
Revocation probation
Roger Allen Huddleston
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/11/1996CASE STORED
01/03/1995Mandate Issued
11/02/1994Opinion issuedAffirmed
09/07/1994Submitted
09/07/1994Submission
08/26/1994Supplemental Transcript filed
08/17/1994Mt file Supp Record DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/08/1994Brief filed
08/08/1994Case ready to be set
08/08/1994Mt file Supplemental Record Filed
08/08/1994Submission
07/18/1994Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
07/11/1994Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
06/21/1994Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
06/17/1994Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
05/24/1994Brief filed
04/20/1994Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
04/14/1994Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
03/23/1994Statement of Facts Filed
03/11/1994Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
03/08/1994Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
03/08/1994Statement of facts overdue
03/07/1994Transcript Filed
02/18/1994Notice of Appeal Filed
02/18/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/03/1995Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
State Prosecuting AttorneyInterested partyThe Honorable Matthew W. Paul
The State Of TexasCriminal - State of TexasMr. Charles R. Kimbrough
Court Of Criminal AppealsInterested partyThe Honorable Troy C. Bennett Jr.
Huddleston, Roger AllenAppellantMs. Verna Victoria Langham
Trial Court Information
22nd District Court
Caldwell
Honorable Fred A. Moore
8758
10 yrs.