Case Information: 38915 | |||
Short Caption: | BOEKHOFF (MARK) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 41551 , 53556 , 62901 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR972391 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 06/17/2002 | How Submitted: | On Briefs |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
12/13/2001 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
12/13/2001 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 01-21027 | |
12/27/2001 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 01-21754 | |
12/27/2001 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: November 14, 2001. To Court Reporter: Debbie Vieira. | 01-21755 | |
01/18/2002 | Transcript | Filed Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: November 14, 2001. Court Reporter: Debbie Vieira. | 02-01274 | |
03/06/2002 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. On January 18, 2002, Ms. Vieira filed a rough draft copy of the requested transcript. We note that because this appeal is not subject to NRAP 3C, the filing of a rough draft transcript rather than a certified copy of the transcript was improper. Nevertheless, in the interests of judicial economy, we waive the requirements of NRAP 9(b) for the filing of a certified copy of the requested transcript, unless either party objects within 10 days from the date of this order to the rough draft transcript filed with this court. On January 31, 2002, appellant submitted a proper person letter and 'Judicial Notice of Adjudicated Facts, (and) Affidavit.' Thereafter, February 26, 2002, appellant submitted a proper person letter and a copy of an affidavit filed in the district court. We note that appellant is represented by counsel and has not been granted leave to file documents in proper person. Accordingly, the clerk of this court shall return, unfiled, the proper person documents received on January 31, 2002, and February 26, 2002. Appellant shall address all concerns relating to this appeal to his counsel of record. | 02-04044 | |
03/06/2002 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Letter. to appellant Mark Edward Boekhoff. Returned unfiled, the original Proper Person Letter with attached Judicial Notice of Adjudicated Facts and Affidavit for the upcoming Appellant's Opening brief that will be submitted by Scott W. Edwards, my attorney of record received January 31, 2002 and the Proper Person Courtesy copy of Memorandum of Points and Authorities to be filed in the Second Judicial District Court received February 26, 2002. | ||
04/05/2002 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 04/05/02. Signed by: Scott W. Edwards. | 02-06064 | |
04/05/2002 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. | 02-06065 | |
04/05/2002 | Appendix | Filed Appendix. Supplemental Appendix. | 02-06066 | |
05/06/2002 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. Mailed on: 05/03/02. Signed by: Joseph R. Plater. | 02-07891 | |
06/17/2002 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. No reply brief filed. | ||
08/09/2002 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. On March 27, 2002, April 29, 2002, and May 17, 2002, Mr. Boekhoff submitted 3 additional proper person documents. We again note that Mr. Boekhoff is represented by counsel on appeal and we decline to grant Mr. Boekhoff permission to file documents in proper person. We direct the clerk of this court to return, unfiled, the proper person documents received on March 27, 2002, April 29, 2002, and May 17, 2002. We again direct Mr. Boekhoff to address all concerns relating to this appeal to his counsel of record. | 02-13666 | |
08/09/2002 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Letter. to appellant Mark Edward Boekhoff. Returned unfiled, the proper person Objection of Rough Draft Transcripts as per NRAP 9(b) received March 27, 2002, the Judicial Notice of Adjudicated Facts, NRS 47.160; Request Permission to Submit NRAP, 46(b) received April 29, 2002, and the Judicial Notice of Adjudicated Facts, NRS 47.160; Request Permission to Submit NRAP 46(b) received May 17, 2002. | ||
04/09/2003 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP03-MS/ML/NB | 03-05949 | |
05/06/2003 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 03-06275 | |
05/06/2003 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
05/12/2003 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 7, 2003. | 03-06275 |