Case Information: 38916 | |||
Short Caption: | SADOSKI (JEANETTE) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 40803 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C161956 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Post-Conviction |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
12/13/2001 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
12/13/2001 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 01-21028 | |
12/13/2001 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 7/5/00; 7/19/00; 9/14/00 and 11/7/00. Court Reporter: Maureen Schorn. Filed in district court on: December 6, 2001. | 01-21029 | |
12/17/2001 | Transcript | Filed Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: 7/5/00; 7/19/00; 9/14/00 and 11/7/00. Court Reporter: Maureen Schorn. | 01-21155 | |
01/24/2002 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 02-01629 | |
01/24/2002 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. | 02-01630 | |
02/13/2002 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 02-02856 | |
07/25/2002 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." NNP02-MS/RR/NB | 02-12732 | |
08/20/2002 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 02-12830 | |
08/20/2002 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
08/29/2002 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 23, 2002. | 02-12830 |