judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals

Case: 02-94-00061-CR
02-94-00061-CR
02/18/1994
Other Felony
T.K.'S Video, Inc.
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/22/1996Mandate Issued
03/27/1996Petition for Discretionary Review Filed in CCARefused
01/30/1996Petition for Discretionary Review Filed in CCA
12/28/1995Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
12/06/1995Letter
11/29/1995Motion for Rehearing Filed
11/09/1995Opinion issuedAffirmed
12/01/1994Letter
11/30/1994Submitted
11/30/1994Submission
11/16/1994Order Entered
09/09/1994Brief Filed
09/09/1994Case ready to be set
08/01/1994Brief Filed
05/19/1994No Description Available.
03/22/1994No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
03/21/1994No Description Available.
03/16/1994No Description Available.Motion or Writ Denied
03/15/1994No Description Available.
03/11/1994Submission
03/11/1994No Description Available.
02/18/1994Notice of Appeal Filed
02/18/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/22/1996Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Unknown UserCriminal - State of TexasBruce Isaacks
T.k.`s Video, Inc.Criminal - AppellantMalcolm Dade
Leslie Gill Martin
Trial Court Information
Honorable Don R. Windle
CR-91-04563-C
$10,000 FINE