judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

PEAK POWDER RIVER RESOURCES, LLC v. LEONORA F. WEST, as Trustee of the Survivor's Trust of the West Family Trust dated October 27, 1987; TOFTE ENERGY PARTNERS, Limited Partnership, a Wyoming limited partnership; McMAHON ENERGY PARTNERS, a Texas limited partnership; MEGHAN M. BABCOCK; TRIPLE S INVESTMENTS, LLC.; LAURA L. DAY; ERIC A. TAYLOR and BRADFORD HOLMES, Co-Trustees of the trust established under the Last Will and Testament of Ray A. Taylor dated January 21, 2009; MICHAEL MATSUDA, Trustee of the Matsuda Mineral Rights Trust dated January 1, 2008; THE DIANA W. KINTZ LIVING TRUST dated November 7, 1990; TRAUTWEIN FAMILY, LLC.; JUDY RAE KOLZ and MATTHEW LAWRENCE KOLZ, Joint Tenants; NELROY, LLC., a Wyoming limited partnership; DONALD A. COOPER and SUZANNE COOPER, husband and wife; MARSHALL & WINSTON, INC., a Nevada corporation; BLACKGOLD ENTERPRISES, LLC., a Wyoming limited liability company; FCN, INC., a Wyoming corporation; IBERLIN MINERAL PARTNERSHIP, a Wyoming general partnership; YATES PETROLEUM CORPORATION; DEVON ENERGY PRODUCTION, L.P.; TIPTOP ENERGY PRODUCTIONS US, LLC.; SAMSON RESOURCES COMPANY; BEAR PEAK RESOURCES, LLC; MEAGHER OIL & GAS PROPERTIES, INC.; MALLARD CREEK OIL COMPANY, L.P., a Texas partnership; 520 OIL COMPANY, L.P., a Texas limited liability company; SHEARWATER RESOURCES, LLC., a Texas limited liability corporation; NOBLITT OIL and GAS, INC., an Oklahoma corporation; RUBY CREEK ROYALTY, L.P.; CENOTE ROYALTY POOL, L.P.; GLASGOW ROYALTIES, L.P.; JOHN L. KENNEDY, Trustee of the John L. Kennedy revocable trust dated October 2, 2008; and LAURIE GEISER,

Case Heading (S-17-0261)
Case Number:S-17-0261Case Docketed On:10/02/2017
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Mines and Minerals (Title 30)
Short Title:PEAK POWDER RIVER RESOURCES, LLC v. LEONORA F. WEST, as Trustee of the Survivor's Trust of the West Family Trust dated October 27, 1987; TOFTE ENERGY PARTNERS, Limited Partnership, a Wyoming limited partnership; McMAHON ENERGY PARTNERS, a Texas limited partnership; MEGHAN M. BABCOCK; TRIPLE S INVESTMENTS, LLC.; LAURA L. DAY; ERIC A. TAYLOR and BRADFORD HOLMES, Co-Trustees of the trust established under the Last Will and Testament of Ray A. Taylor dated January 21, 2009; MICHAEL MATSUDA, Trustee of the Matsuda Mineral Rights Trust dated January 1, 2008; THE DIANA W. KINTZ LIVING TRUST dated November 7, 1990; TRAUTWEIN FAMILY, LLC.; JUDY RAE KOLZ and MATTHEW LAWRENCE KOLZ, Joint Tenants; NELROY, LLC., a Wyoming limited partnership; DONALD A. COOPER and SUZANNE COOPER, husband and wife; MARSHALL & WINSTON, INC., a Nevada corporation; BLACKGOLD ENTERPRISES, LLC., a Wyoming limited liability company; FCN, INC., a Wyoming corporation; IBERLIN MINERAL PARTNERSHIP, a Wyoming general partnership; YATES PETROLEUM CORPORATION; DEVON ENERGY PRODUCTION, L.P.; TIPTOP ENERGY PRODUCTIONS US, LLC.; SAMSON RESOURCES COMPANY; BEAR PEAK RESOURCES, LLC; MEAGHER OIL & GAS PROPERTIES, INC.; MALLARD CREEK OIL COMPANY, L.P., a Texas partnership; 520 OIL COMPANY, L.P., a Texas limited liability company; SHEARWATER RESOURCES, LLC., a Texas limited liability corporation; NOBLITT OIL and GAS, INC., an Oklahoma corporation; RUBY CREEK ROYALTY, L.P.; CENOTE ROYALTY POOL, L.P.; GLASGOW ROYALTIES, L.P.; JOHN L. KENNEDY, Trustee of the John L. Kennedy revocable trust dated October 2, 2008; and LAURIE GEISER,
Full Title:PEAK POWDER RIVER RESOURCES, LLC, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. LEONORA F. WEST, as Trustee of the Survivor's Trust of the West Family Trust dated October 27, 1987; TOFTE ENERGY PARTNERS, Limited Partnership, a Wyoming limited partnership; McMAHON ENERGY PARTNERS, a Texas limited partnership; MEGHAN M. BABCOCK; TRIPLE S INVESTMENTS, LLC.; LAURA L. DAY; ERIC A. TAYLOR and BRADFORD HOLMES, Co-Trustees of the trust established under the Last Will and Testament of Ray A. Taylor dated January 21, 2009; MICHAEL MATSUDA, Trustee of the Matsuda Mineral Rights Trust dated January 1, 2008; THE DIANA W. KINTZ LIVING TRUST dated November 7, 1990; TRAUTWEIN FAMILY, LLC.; JUDY RAE KOLZ and MATTHEW LAWRENCE KOLZ, Joint Tenants; NELROY, LLC., a Wyoming limited partnership; DONALD A. COOPER and SUZANNE COOPER, husband and wife; MARSHALL & WINSTON, INC., a Nevada corporation; BLACKGOLD ENTERPRISES, LLC., a Wyoming limited liability company; FCN, INC., a Wyoming corporation; IBERLIN MINERAL PARTNERSHIP, a Wyoming general partnership; YATES PETROLEUM CORPORATION; DEVON ENERGY PRODUCTION, L.P.; TIPTOP ENERGY PRODUCTIONS US, LLC.; SAMSON RESOURCES COMPANY; BEAR PEAK RESOURCES, LLC; MEAGHER OIL & GAS PROPERTIES, INC.; MALLARD CREEK OIL COMPANY, L.P., a Texas partnership; 520 OIL COMPANY, L.P., a Texas limited liability company; SHEARWATER RESOURCES, LLC., a Texas limited liability corporation; NOBLITT OIL and GAS, INC., an Oklahoma corporation; RUBY CREEK ROYALTY, L.P.; CENOTE ROYALTY POOL, L.P.; GLASGOW ROYALTIES, L.P.; JOHN L. KENNEDY, Trustee of the John L. Kennedy revocable trust dated October 2, 2008; and LAURIE GEISER, Appellees (Defendants)

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantPeak Powder River Resources, LLCJ. Kenneth Barbe II
Hampton K. O'Neill
Patrick Robert Tolley
AppelleeLeonora F. WestRandall T. Cox
AppelleeTofte Energy Partners, Limited Partnership Pro Se
AppelleeMcMahon Energy Partners, Limited Partnership Pro Se
AppelleeMeghan M. Babcock Pro Se
AppelleeTriple S Investments. LLCKeith P. Tyler
AppelleeLaura L. DayKeith P. Tyler
AppelleeEric A. TaylorOrintha Elizabeth Karns
Drake D. Hill
AppelleeBradford HolmesOrintha Elizabeth Karns
Drake D. Hill
AppelleeMichael MatsudaBlair J. Trautwein
Michael Stewart Samelson
AppelleeThe Diana W. Kintz Living TrustBlair J. Trautwein
Michael Stewart Samelson
AppelleeTrautwein Family, LLCBlair J. Trautwein
Michael Stewart Samelson
AppelleeJudy Rae KolzBlair J. Trautwein
Michael Stewart Samelson
AppelleeMatthew Lawrence KolzBlair J. Trautwein
Michael Stewart Samelson
AppelleeMarshall & Winston, INC.Scott Michael Campbell
Aaron Gerard Norris
AppelleeFCN, INC.Bruce S. Asay
AppelleeDevon Energy Production Company, L.P.Jeffery James Oven
Uriah Jacob Price
AppelleeBear Peak Resources, LLCAmanda Kay Roberts
Dan B. Riggs
AppelleeNelroy, LLC Pro Se
AppelleeDonald A. Cooper Pro Se
AppelleeSuzanne Cooper Pro Se
AppelleeBlackgold Enterprises, LLC Pro Se
AppelleeIberlin Mineral Partnership Pro Se
AppelleeYates Petroleum Corporation Pro Se
AppelleeTiptop Energy Production US, LLC Pro Se
AppelleeSamson Resources Company Pro Se
AppelleeMeagher Oil & Gas Properties, INC. Pro Se
AppelleeMallard Creek Oil Company. L.P. Pro Se
Appellee520 Oil Company, L.P. Pro Se
AppelleeShearwater Resources, LLC. Pro Se
AppelleeNoblitt Oil and Gas, INC. Pro Se
AppelleeRuby Creek Royalty, L.P. Pro Se
AppelleeCenote Royalty Pool, L.P. Pro Se
AppelleeGlasgow Royalties, L.P. Pro Se
AppelleeJohn L. Kennedy Pro Se
AppelleeLaurie Geiser Pro Se

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
10/02/2017Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
10/02/2017Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
10/02/2017Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
10/02/2017Notice-Outgoing - E-filing requirement to Hampton K. O'Neill, Patrick R. Tolley, Keith P. Tyler, Michael S. Samelson, Scott M. Campbell, Aaron G. Norris and Uriah Jacob PriceNotice-OutgoingE-filing requirementFinal
10/02/2017Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
10/02/2017Notice-Incoming - District Court Pleading - Peak Powder River Resources, LLC's Motion for W.R.C.P. 54(b) CertificationNotice-IncomingDistrict Court PleadingFinal
10/24/2017Order Dismissing AppealOrderDismiss - jurisdictionFinal
11/09/2017Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal