judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

LASSITER JR., JAMES E. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 82-CF-1517
Short Caption:LASSITER JR., JAMES E. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Burglary
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F173-78Filed Date:10/28/1982

Opening Event Date:10/28/1982Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:03/28/1983Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:08/16/1983
Argued/Submitted:11/17/1983
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Marie E. Haldane YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901LASSITER JR., JAMES E. UNITED STATES
10/28/1982FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
03/28/1983FiledRecord Completed
08/16/1983FiledBriefing Completed
11/17/1983FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
12/23/1983FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition