judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals

Case: 01-94-00177-CR
01-94-00177-CR
02/18/1994
Felony DWI
Woodard, Joe Willie
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/03/1995Mandate issued - criminal or civil
11/03/1995Mandate issued - criminal or civil
08/04/1995Motion for rehearing was not filed
07/20/1995Opinion issuedAffirmed
07/20/1995Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/23/1995Submission
01/23/1995Submitted
01/23/1995Submission
01/23/1995Submitted
12/09/1994Brief filed-oral argument has been waived
12/09/1994Case ready to be set
12/09/1994Case ready to be set
11/17/1994Brief filed-oral argument has been waived
11/17/1994Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
11/08/1994Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
10/20/1994Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
10/07/1994Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
09/08/1994Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
08/31/1994Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
08/04/1994Motion to extend time to file state of facts dispGrant motion
08/04/1994Statement of facts filed
07/25/1994Motion to extend time to file statement of facts
07/18/1994Statement of facts filed
07/07/1994Motion to extend time to file state of facts dispGrant motion
06/29/1994Motion to extend time to file statement of facts
05/26/1994Motion to extend time to file state of facts dispGrant motion
05/17/1994Motion to extend time to file statement of facts
04/07/1994Motion to extend time to file state of facts dispGrant motion
03/29/1994Motion to extend time to file statement of facts
02/23/1994Transcript filed
02/18/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
02/17/1994Notice of appeal filed
10/28/1993Date of Sentence in Criminal Case
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/03/1995Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
WOODARD, JOE WILLIECriminal - AppellantRon Johnson
TEXAS, THE STATE OFCriminal - State of TexasKeli Pool Roper
John B. Holmes
Trial Court Information
337th District Court
Harris
Honorable JAMES L. BARR
636,129
30 yrs tdc