judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals

Case: 04-81-00423-CR
04-81-00423-CR
11/12/1981
Habeas Corpus
Ex Parte: Armando C. Acosta
Texas, The State of
Yes
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/18/1983Opinion issuedDismissed-Want of Jurisdiction
05/18/1983Opinion issuedDismissed-Want of Jurisdiction
02/18/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/02/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
01/25/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
01/06/1982Appeal Reinstated
01/06/1982No Description Available.
01/06/1982No Description Available.
01/06/1982No Description Available.
01/06/1982No Description Available.
01/06/1982Appeal Reinstated
12/23/1981Supplemental Brief Filed
11/25/1981Opinion issuedAbated
11/25/1981Opinion issuedAbated
11/12/1981No Description Available.
11/12/1981No Description Available.
11/12/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
11/10/1981Brief Filed
11/10/1981Brief Filed
11/10/1981Pet. for Writ of Habeas Corpus Filed
11/10/1981No Description Available.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/18/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
81st Judicial District Court
Karnes
Honorable J. T. Brite
853
unknown