Case Heading (S-17-0262) | |||||
Case Number: | S-17-0262 | Case Docketed On: | 10/04/2017 | ||
Status: | Closed | ||||
Original Court: | Fifth Judicial District Hot Springs County | Case Type: | Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509 | ||
Short Title: | MATTHEW T. SCHWAN v. THE STATE OF WYOMING | ||||
Full Title: | MATTHEW T. SCHWAN, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff). |
- Party Information |
Role | Party Name | Attorney(s) |
Appellant | Matthew T. Schwan | Diane M. Lozano Tina N. Olson Desiree Wilson |
Appellee | The State of Wyoming | Peter K. Michael Christyne Marie Martens |
- Case Decision Information | |
Issues: | |
Opinion Number: | |
Citation: |
Docketing Filter View |
Display: |
Docket Information | |||||
Filing Date | Document Description | Docket Entry Type | Docket Entry Subtype | Status | |
10/04/2017 | Event - Docketed and indexed | Event | Docketed and indexed | Final | |
10/04/2017 | Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district court | Notice-Incoming | Record completion notice from district court | Final | |
10/04/2017 | Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letter | Notice-Outgoing | Docketing letter | Final | |
10/09/2017 | Notice-Incoming - Amended index | Notice-Incoming | Amended index | Final | |
11/16/2017 | Motion - Extension of time - brief | Motion | Extension of time - brief | Final | |
11/17/2017 | Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for extension of time | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
11/17/2017 | Order - Grant - extension of time | Order | Grant - extension of time | Final | |
12/12/2017 | Motion - Dismiss - voluntary with waiver | Motion | Dismiss - voluntary with waiver | Final | |
12/13/2017 | Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Voluntary Dismissal of Appeal and Waiver of Appeal | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
12/13/2017 | Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulated | Order | Dismiss - voluntary or stipulated | Final | |
12/13/2017 | Event - Case closed | Event | Case closed | Final |