judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 04-94-00088-CR
04-94-00088-CR
02/18/1994
Assault or Attempted Murder
Sharp, Brett Randall
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/30/2017Internal memo
08/24/1995Mandate Issued
08/24/1995Mandate Issued
06/21/1995Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/21/1995Opinion issuedAffirmed
12/13/1994Submitted
12/13/1994Submission
12/13/1994Submitted
11/04/1994Submission
10/24/1994Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/17/1994Brief Filed
10/17/1994Case ready to be set
10/17/1994Brief Recd (If in excess of page limit and/or late)
10/17/1994Case ready to be set
10/14/1994Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
09/19/1994Brief Filed
09/06/1994Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/29/1994Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
07/29/1994No Description Available.
06/20/1994Order Entered
06/17/1994No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
06/06/1994No Description Available.
04/28/1994No Description Available.
04/28/1994No Description Available.
04/15/1994No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
04/04/1994No Description Available.
02/18/1994Notice of Appeal Filed
02/18/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
02/08/1994Motion for New Trial Filed
02/02/1994Date of Sentencing in Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/30/2017Case StoredCase archived
08/24/2020RetentionDate criminal case will be destroyed (25 years after mandate)
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Texas, The State OfCriminal - State of TexasDaniel Thornberry
Sharp, Brett RandallCriminal - AppellantDinah L. Gaines
Trial Court Information
290th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Sharon S Macrae
93-CR-3642
10 years