judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 3rd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 03-94-00085-CV
03-94-00085-CV
02/18/1994
Intentional tort, other
James W. Johnston
M & M Vehicle Transport, Inc.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/30/2004Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
10/22/1996CASE STORED
05/30/1995Mandate Issued
04/05/1995Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
02/22/1995Submitted
02/22/1995Submission
01/24/1995Submission
12/02/1994Oral argument request overruled by CourtOverruled
11/18/1994Brief filed
11/18/1994Case ready to be set
10/24/1994Brief filed
09/22/1994Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
09/22/1994Motion for Dismissal DisposedOverruled
04/25/1994Motion for Dismissal Filed
04/15/1994Appellant's brief overdue notice in criminal case
02/25/1994Response requested (postcard)
02/25/1994Supplemental Transcript filed
02/18/1994Transcript Filed
02/18/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/30/1995Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Hernandez, JoeInterested partyMr. Pedro R. Hernandez
Johnston, James W.AppellantMr. D. Phillip Adkins
M & M Vehicle Transport, Inc.AppelleeMr. Kirk W. Tate
Trial Court Information
250th District Court
Travis
Honorable John K. Dietz
92-14956-A