Case: 14-83-00817-CV
14-83-00817-CV
12/08/1983
Contract
Gavenda, John David, Et Al
Strata Energy, Inc., Et Al
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
07/10/1985 | Writ of Error DISPOSED | GRANTED | |
03/04/1985 | Writ of Error FILED | | |
02/19/1985 | Writ of Error FILED | | |
01/31/1985 | Mtn.for Rehearing DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO SE,STA | OVERRULED | |
01/17/1985 | Mtn.for Rehearing DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO SE,STA | OVERRULED | |
01/16/1985 | Response to Motion FILED-ANT,APE,APP,RES,STA | | |
01/04/1985 | Motion for Rehearing FILED-ANT,APE,REL,RES,STA | | |
01/04/1985 | Motion for Rehearing FILED-ANT,APE,REL,RES,STA | | |
12/20/1984 | Opinion issued | AFFIRMED IN PART AND REVERSED AND REMANDED IN PART | |
08/23/1984 | Mtn.to supplement transcript DISPOSED-ANT,APE,STA | GRANTED | |
08/16/1984 | Response to Motion FILED-ANT,APE,APP,RES,STA | | |
08/07/1984 | Opposition filed | | |
08/03/1984 | Mtn.to supplement transcript FILED-ANT,APE,STA | | |
07/26/1984 | Supplemental transcript RECEIVED - ANT,APE,STA | | |
07/18/1984 | Submission | | |
04/30/1984 | Case ready to be set | | |
04/03/1984 | AM CUR, OTHER, | | |
03/08/1984 | Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | GRANTED | |
03/01/1984 | Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
02/07/1984 | AM CUR, OTHER, | | |
01/12/1984 | Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | GRANTED | |
12/30/1983 | Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
12/08/1983 | Exhibits Filed | | |
12/08/1983 | Letter from atty with address change | | |
12/08/1983 | Transcript FILED | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
07/15/1985 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Mannesman Piper & Steel Corporation | Appellant | |
Mannesman Piper & Steel Corporation | Appellee | |
Mannesman Piper & Steel Corporation | Appellee | |
Mannesman Piper & Steel Corporation | Appellee | |
Mannesman Piper & Steel Corporation | Appellee |
Trial Court Information
215th District Court
Harris
82-53428