judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MILES, JESSIE J. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 84-CM-1696
Short Caption:MILES, JESSIE J. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Weapons Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M4653-84Filed Date:12/13/1984

Opening Event Date:12/13/1984Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:04/23/1986Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:08/05/1986
Argued/Submitted:11/12/1986
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Mary L. WilsonYY
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Mary A. Terrell YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901MILES, JESSIE J. UNITED STATES
12/13/1984FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
04/23/1986FiledRecord Completed
08/05/1986FiledBriefing Completed
11/12/1986FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
11/21/1986FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition