Case Heading (S-16-0280) | |||||
Case Number: | S-16-0280 | Case Docketed On: | 12/09/2016 | ||
Status: | Closed | ||||
Original Court: | First Judicial District Laramie County | Case Type: | Direct Appeal - Criminal - Sentencing 6-10-101 - 6-10-301 | ||
Short Title: | DEMEITREUS TORREZ DREW v. THE STATE OF WYOMING | ||||
Full Title: | DEMEITREUS TORREZ DREW, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff). |
- Party Information |
Role | Party Name | Attorney(s) |
Appellant | Demeitreus Torrez Drew | Pro Se |
Appellee | The State of Wyoming | Peter K. Michael David L. Delicath Christyne Marie Martens |
- Case Decision Information | |
Issues: | Criminal Law |
Opinion Number: | 2017 WY 40 |
Citation: |
Docketing Filter View |
Display: |
Docket Information | |||||
Filing Date | Document Description | Docket Entry Type | Docket Entry Subtype | Status | |
12/09/2016 | Event - Docketed and indexed | Event | Docketed and indexed | Final | |
12/09/2016 | Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district court | Notice-Incoming | Record completion notice from district court | Final | |
12/09/2016 | Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letter | Notice-Outgoing | Docketing letter | Final | |
01/19/2017 | Motion - Extension of time - brief | Motion | Extension of time - brief | Final | |
01/20/2017 | Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
01/20/2017 | Order - Grant - extension of time | Order | Grant - extension of time | Final | |
01/23/2017 | Record - Court Reporter's certificate of completion (Bond Hearing transcript) | Record | Court Reporter's certificate of completion | Final | |
02/15/2017 | Brief - Anders | Brief | Anders | Final | |
02/15/2017 | Motion - Extension of time - brief | Motion | Extension of time - brief | Final | |
02/15/2017 | Motion - Withdrawal of counsel | Motion | Withdrawal of counsel | Final | |
02/15/2017 | Record - Received unfiled record from Office of the State Public Defender, five volumes. | Record | Received unfiled record | Final | |
02/15/2017 | Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant Pursuant to Anders v. California, 386 U.S. 738 (1967); Motion for Extension of Time to File Pro Se Brief; and Motion to Withdraw as Counsel | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
02/15/2017 | Order - Grant Anders Extension pro se brief | Order | Grant Anders Extension pro se brief | Final | |
04/04/2017 | Failure to File - Brief of appellant (pro-se) | Failure to File | Brief of appellant | Final | |
04/18/2017 | Notice-Outgoing - E-filing requirement | Notice-Outgoing | E-filing requirement | Final | |
04/19/2017 | Opinion - Published Order Affirming Order Denying Motion to Correct Illegal Sentence | Opinion | Published order | Final | |
05/05/2017 | Notice-Outgoing - Mandate | Notice-Outgoing | Mandate | Final | |
05/05/2017 | Record - Returned unfiled record to Clerk of the District Court | Record | Returned unfiled record | Final | |
05/05/2017 | Notice-Outgoing - Record return letter | Notice-Outgoing | Record return letter | Final | |
05/05/2017 | Event - Case closed | Event | Case closed | Final | |
05/09/2017 | Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 5/8/2017 by Diane Sanchez | Service | Certified mail signature return card | Final |