judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 9th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 09-81-00065-CV
09-81-00065-CV
12/07/1981
Contract
Railroad Commission of Texas, et al
Exxon Corporation
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/29/1983Mandate Issued
04/29/1983Case stored
03/23/1983No Description Available.Refused
10/14/1982Petition for Writ
09/16/1982Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
08/19/1982Opinion issuedReversed & Rendered
02/25/1982Supplemental Brief Filed
02/12/1982Brief Filed
01/18/1982Brief Filed
12/07/1981Transcript & SOF Filed (Crim)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/29/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
1A District Court
Tyler
Honorable Monte D. Lawlis
11,074