judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals

Case: 01-82-00045-CR
01-82-00045-CR
12/08/1981
Other Felony
Meachum, Carl Louis
State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/12/1982Mandate issued - criminal or civil
11/12/1982Mandate issued - criminal or civil
11/11/1982Opinion issuedOtherwise disposed
09/26/1982No description available.
03/24/1982Record filed
03/24/1982Case ready to be set
12/08/1981Notice of appeal filed
12/08/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/12/1982Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateCriminal - State of Texas
StateCriminal - Appellant
Trial Court Information