Case Heading (S-18-0263) | |||||
Case Number: | S-18-0263 | Case Docketed On: | 11/19/2018 | ||
Linked To: | S-18-0231 | ||||
Status: | Closed | ||||
Original Court: | First Judicial District Laramie County | Case Type: | Direct Appeal - Civil - Wyoming State Constitution | ||
Short Title: | JONMICHAEL GUY v. ROBERT O. LAMPERT, individually and in his official capacity as Director of the Wyoming Department of Corrections; JULIE TENNANT-CAINE, individually and in her official capacity as a Deputy Administrator of the Wyoming Department of Corrections; and WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, by and through Robert O. Lampert, and the STATE OF WYOMING | ||||
Full Title: | JONMICHAEL GUY, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. ROBERT O. LAMPERT, individually and in his official capacity as Director of the Wyoming Department of Corrections; JULIE TENNANT-CAINE, individually and in her official capacity as a Deputy Administrator of the Wyoming Department of Corrections; and WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, by and through Robert O. Lampert, and the STATE OF WYOMING, Appellees (Defendants). |
- Party Information |
Role | Party Name | Attorney(s) |
Appellant | JonMichael Guy | Steve C.M. Aron Alexander John Mencer |
Appellee | Robert O. Lampert | Daniel E. White Bridget L. Hill Michael James McGrady |
Appellee | Julie Tennant-Caine | Daniel E. White Bridget L. Hill Michael James McGrady |
Appellee | Department of Corrections | Daniel E. White Bridget L. Hill Michael James McGrady |
Appellee | The State of Wyoming | Daniel E. White Bridget L. Hill Michael James McGrady |
- Case Decision Information | |
Issues: | Attorney Fees, Civil Rights, Constitutional Law |
Opinion Number: | 2019 WY 69 |
Citation: |
Docketing Filter View |
Display: |
Docket Information | |||||
Filing Date | Document Description | Docket Entry Type | Docket Entry Subtype | Status | |
11/19/2018 | Event - Docketed and indexed | Event | Docketed and indexed | Final | |
11/19/2018 | Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district court | Notice-Incoming | Record completion notice from district court | Final | |
11/19/2018 | Fees - Docket fee received | Fees | Docket fee received | Final | |
11/19/2018 | Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letter | Notice-Outgoing | Docketing letter | Final | |
11/26/2018 | Motion - Consolidate Appeal with S-18-0231 for purposes of argument and decision | Motion | Consolidate | Final | |
11/28/2018 | Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to Consolidate Appeal with S-18-0231 | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
11/28/2018 | Order - Consolidating cases (for purposes of oral argument and decision). | Order | Consolidating cases | Final | |
01/07/2019 | Brief - Appellant | Brief | Appellant | Final | |
01/09/2019 | Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Brief; and received Appellant's Designation of Record on Appeal | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
01/30/2019 | Motion - Withdrawal of counsel | Motion | Withdrawal of counsel | Final | |
01/30/2019 | Event - Hardcopy received - Counsel's (Berkness) Motion to Withdraw | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
01/31/2019 | Order Allowing Withdrawal of Counsel | Order | Granting withdrawal of counsel | Final | |
02/19/2019 | Motion - Extension of time - brief | Motion | Extension of time - brief | Final | |
02/19/2019 | Event - Hardcopy received - Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief of Appellee | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
02/19/2019 | Order Granting Appellee's Request for Extension to File Brief | Order | Grant - extension of time | Final | |
02/28/2019 | Brief - Appellee | Brief | Appellee | Final | |
03/01/2019 | Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellees; and received copy of designation of record on appeal | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
03/07/2019 | Order - Oral argument scheduled | Order | Oral argument scheduled | Final | |
03/08/2019 | Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Daniel White o/b/o the appellee | Notice-Incoming | Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting | Final | |
03/18/2019 | Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal | Notice-Outgoing | Request for transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
03/18/2019 | Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from C.M. Aron obo Appellant | Notice-Incoming | Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting | Final | |
04/01/2019 | Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, four volumes, original papers. | Record | Transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
04/01/2019 | Notice-Outgoing - Record filed | Notice-Outgoing | Record filed | Final | |
04/01/2019 | Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filed | Notice-Outgoing | Transmitted record on appeal filed | Final | |
04/10/2019 | Notice-Internal - Oral argument notice, argued before Chief Justice Davis, Justices Fox, Kautz, Boomgaarden and Gray (Steve C.M. Aron o/b/o appellant; Daniel E. White o/b/o appellee) and taken under advisement | Notice-Internal | Oral argument notice | Final | |
07/09/2019 | Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming with Justice Fox writing for the Court | Opinion | Opinion and journal order | Final | |
07/25/2019 | Record - Record returned to district court (hand-delivered by Patty Bennett on 7/25/2019) | Record | Record returned to district court | Final | |
07/25/2019 | Notice-Outgoing - Mandate | Notice-Outgoing | Mandate | Final | |
07/25/2019 | Notice-Outgoing - Record return letter | Notice-Outgoing | Record return letter | Final | |
07/25/2019 | Event - Case closed | Event | Case closed | Final | |
09/23/2019 | Notice-Incoming - U.S. Supreme Court - extension granted from Justice Sotomayor until December 6, 2019 in which to file a petition for a writ of certiorari. | Notice-Incoming | U.S. Supreme Court | Final | |
12/12/2019 | Notice-Incoming - U.S. Supreme Court - Petition for Writ of Certiorari was filed on December 6, 2019 | Notice-Incoming | U.S. Supreme Court | Final | |
03/12/2020 | Notice-Incoming - U.S. Supreme Court - petition for writ of certiorari denied | Notice-Incoming | U.S. Supreme Court | Final |