judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MERCER, WILLIAM D. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 84-CM-1742
Short Caption:MERCER, WILLIAM D. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M4460-84Filed Date:12/13/1984

Opening Event Date:12/13/1984Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:05/19/1986Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:08/27/1986
Argued/Submitted:12/11/1986
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
T. Kernahan Buck YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Elizabeth TrosmanYY
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901MERCER, WILLIAM D. UNITED STATES
12/13/1984FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
05/19/1986FiledRecord Completed
08/27/1986FiledBriefing Completed
12/11/1986FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
12/11/1986FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted