judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

WIGGINS, JAMES C. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 84-CM-1723
Short Caption:WIGGINS, JAMES C. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Other Misdemeanor
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M10678-84Filed Date:12/07/1984

Opening Event Date:12/07/1984Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:01/31/1986Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:09/02/1986
Argued/Submitted:12/11/1986
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Diane S. Lepley YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Debra L. Long-Doyle YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901WIGGINS, JAMES C. UNITED STATES
12/07/1984FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
01/31/1986FiledRecord Completed
09/02/1986FiledBriefing Completed
12/11/1986FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
03/04/1987FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition