Case Information: 33951 | |||
Short Caption: | KINDRED VS. A.G. EDWARDS | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 34084 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV9806978 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 03/31/1999 / Allison, George | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/26/1999 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 99-02208 | |
03/26/1999 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Jack E. Kennedy & Associates--check no. 0004093. | ||
03/31/1999 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: George V. Allison. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.) | ||
04/08/1999 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 99-02673 | |
04/30/1999 | Motion | Filed Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. | 99-03480 | |
05/14/1999 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Stipulated Dismissal. The parties' stipulation for voluntary dismissal of this appeal is approved. "This appeal is dismissed." SNP/CLK | 99-03946 | |
05/14/1999 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |