Case: 05-99-00037-CV
05-99-00037-CV
01/11/1999
Miscellaneous civil
Hope, Patricia Louise
Connell, Jr., George T.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
02/16/1999 | Number Voided | Voided | |
02/16/1999 | Number Voided | Voided | |
02/09/1999 | Notice to clerk that record is late | | |
02/09/1999 | Notice to reporter that record is late | | |
02/01/1999 | Record due | | |
01/11/1999 | 125.00 Filing Fee Paid | | |
01/11/1999 | Docketing Statement Filed | | |
01/11/1999 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
01/11/1999 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
12/28/1998 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
12/03/1998 | Judgment Entered by the Trial Court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
02/16/1999 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Patricia Louise Hope | Appellant | William Charles Campbell |
George T. Connell, Jr. | Appellee | Randall C. Reed |
Jan Dugger | Court Reporter - Trial Court | Janet L. Dugger |
Trial Court Information
296th Judicial District Court
Collin
Honorable Nathan White
296-1490-97