judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

TIMOTHY FLOYD BUTZ v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (06-215)
Case Number:06-215Case Docketed On:09/21/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fourth Judicial District Sheridan CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against Morals, Decency and Family 6-4-101 - 6-4-502
Short Title:TIMOTHY FLOYD BUTZ v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:TIMOTHY FLOYD BUTZ, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantTimothy Floyd ButzDiane M. Lozano
Donna D. Domonkos
Diane Elizabeth Courselle
Patricia Lara
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Leda M. Pojman

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 152
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
09/21/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
09/21/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
09/21/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
11/06/2006Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
11/07/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
12/13/2006Notice-Incoming - Consent of Client for Patricia Lara to appear on behalf of appellant.Notice-IncomingConsent of ClientFinal
12/13/2006Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
12/15/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
01/31/2007Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
02/01/2007Order - Grant - third extension of timeOrderGrant - third extension of timeFinal
03/05/2007Brief - Appellant; received copy of designation of record and brief on disk.BriefAppellantFinal
04/05/2007Brief - Appellee; received copy of designation of record and brief on disk.BriefAppelleeFinal
04/16/2007Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
04/19/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Leda PojmanNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
04/23/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
04/23/2007Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
04/25/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Patricia Lara, Student Intern, Diane Courselle, Tina KerinNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
04/26/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, four volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts; Volume III, Confidential Documents; Volume IV, State's ExhibitsRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
05/09/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Patricia Lara, Student InternNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/16/2007Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Diane E. Courselle, Director, DAP and Patricia Lara, Student Intern, argument by Ms. Lara for appellant; Leda M. Pojman, Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
05/16/2007Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
09/21/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order, affirming. Justice Kite writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
10/09/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
10/09/2007Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
10/09/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
10/09/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
10/11/2007Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 10/10/07 by Roger D. Calkins.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal