judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MORROW, RHEA B. A.

Case Information: 80-FM-0114
Short Caption:MORROW, RHEA B. A.Classification:Appeals - Family - Mental Health
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:MH830-79Filed Date:01/17/1980

Opening Event Date:01/17/1980Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:01/07/1981Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:10/15/1982
Argued/Submitted:02/17/1983
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901MORROW, RHEA B. A. IN THE MATTER OF:
01/17/1980FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
01/07/1981FiledRecord Completed
10/15/1982FiledBriefing Completed
02/17/1983FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
07/12/1983FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition