judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

STATE OF TEXAS v. RAGLAND CLINIC HOSPITAL

Case: 7923
7923
10/01/1941
Application for Writ of Error
STATE OF TEXAS
RAGLAND CLINIC HOSPITAL
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
02/25/1942Motion for RehearingRespondent
02/25/1942Motion for RehearingRespondent
01/06/1942Brief on the MeritsRespondent
01/06/1942Response to PetitionRespondent
11/26/1941Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
11/13/1941Motion for RehearingPetitioner
11/13/1941Motion for RehearingPetitioner
10/17/1941Response to PetitionRespondent
10/08/1941Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
10/01/1941Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
08/20/1942Letter Filed
02/25/1942Motion for RehearingOverruled
02/25/1942Motion for RehearingOverruled
01/06/1942Brief on the Merits
01/06/1942Response to Petition
12/12/1941Motion to ExpediteFiling granted
12/12/1941Motion to ExpediteFiling granted
11/26/1941Document received (See Remarks)
11/26/1941Document received (See Remarks)
11/26/1941Application for Writ of Error - Filed
11/26/1941Document received (See Remarks)
11/26/1941Document received (See Remarks)
11/13/1941Motion for RehearingFiling granted
11/13/1941Motion for RehearingFiling granted
10/17/1941Response to Petition
10/17/1941Motion to dismiss
10/10/1941Document received (See Remarks)
10/10/1941Document received (See Remarks)
10/08/1941Application for Writ of Error - Filed
10/08/1941Document received (See Remarks)
10/08/1941Document received (See Remarks)
10/01/1941Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Ragland Clinic HospitalRespondent
State of TexasPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information