judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DOBY, CHARLES L. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 84-CM-1655
Short Caption:DOBY, CHARLES L. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Weapons Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M7349-84Filed Date:11/30/1984

Opening Event Date:11/30/1984Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:03/12/1985Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:05/09/1988
Argued/Submitted:11/10/1988
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/28/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
James G. Mcguire YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
W. Mark Nebeker YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901DOBY, CHARLES L. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 071685 ORD: DENY MO FOR RT W/O NOTE - 01 PREJUDICE TO ITS RENEWAL BEFOR NOTE - 02 THE TRIAL CRT; GRANT MO FOR NOTE - 02 EXT OF TM TO FL BRF & COUNSEL NOTE - 03 FOR APLT TO ADVISE RE DISP OF NOTE - 03 MO FOR RT. NOTE - 04 2/9/88 ORD: GRT APLT'S MO FOR NOTE - 04 LV TO FILE BRIEF; CLK IS DIRTD NOTE - 05 TO FILE LODGED BRIEF. FO THAT NOTE - 05 APLE'S BRIEF SHALL BE FILED NOTE - 06 W/I 30 DAYS FROM DATE OF THIS NOTE - 06 ORDER.
01/01/1905TRDATE- 88/11/10 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - MCGUIREJA FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - NEBEKERW FOR - APPELLEE
11/30/1984FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
01/18/1985APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) JAMES G. MCGUIRE, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/30/1985RECORD ON APPEAL (RTC) SED PANEL SCDATE 013085 SCHPRD R
03/07/1985SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (22 PGS - DILLARD) DS PANEL SCDATE 011385 SCHPRD RT
03/12/1985FiledRecord Completed
04/15/1985APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JUNE 15, 1985 RJG PANEL SCDATE 042285 SCHPRD BA
05/02/1985SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 DS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/06/1985ORDER MO GRANTED; APLT BRIEF DUE 6/15-NFX. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 042985 SCHPRD OPE
06/17/1985MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION MOTION OF APPELLANT FOR ORDER DIRECTING PREPARATION OF TRANSCRIPT DS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/17/1985APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 30 DAYS AFTER PREPARATION OF SEPTEMBER 26TH TRANSCRIPT RJG PANEL SCDATE 061585 SCHPRD BA
07/16/1985ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-03 ACG PANELPY SCDATE 070185 SCHPRD OPE
08/23/1985ORDER SS, COUNSEL FOR APLT IN 10 DAYS TO FL STATEMENT RE STATUS OF MO FOR RT IN TRIAL CRT. AG PANELPY SCDATE 081685 SCHPRD CHECK
09/13/1985RECEIVED APPELLANT'S STATUS REPORT ON RT RJG PANEL SCDATE 090385 SCHPRD ANSA
10/15/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (156 PGS - PALMER) PB PANEL SCDATE 120287 SCHPRD RT
10/21/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/30/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 12/10/87 PB PANEL SCDATE 113087 SCHPRD BA
12/21/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 1/1/88 PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/11/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/11/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/09/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF SL PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/09/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 4 THRU 6 SL PANELPY SCDATE 020288 SCHPRD N
03/09/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 4/7/88 PB (PB) PANEL SCDATE 031088 SCHPRD BE
04/06/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MAY 10, 1988 RJG PANEL SCDATE 040788 SCHPRD BE
04/25/1988ORDER GRT APLE MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF TO 5/10/88-NFX PB PANELPY SCDATE 042288 SCHPRD V
05/09/1988FiledBriefing Completed
05/09/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF GT PANEL SCDATE 051088 SCHPRD BE
05/24/1988APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE REPLY BRIEF OF APPELLANT TO JUNE 17TH JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/29/1988ORDER GRT APLT'S MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL REPLY BRIEF WITHIN 10 DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORD. PB PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/13/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION REQUESTING ORAL ARGUMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/14/1988LETTER GRANT REQ OF APLT FOR ORAL ARG ON SUM CAL OF 11/10/88. DAS PANELDDW SCDATE 092688 SCHPRD OPE
11/08/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/10/1988FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
11/10/1988ARGUED PANELRGMKTE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/10/1988APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE REPLY BRIEF APPELLANT'S MLR PANEL SCDATE 071188 SCHPRD RBA
11/10/1988ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT FOR LV TO FL RBA & CLK TO FL RBA. DAS PANELROMKTE SCDATE 111788 SCHPRD OPE
11/10/1988APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/07/1988AFFIRMED JDGMT AF JDGMT OF CONVICTION PANELRGMKTE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/07/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -OPN JUDGE -TE CITE 550 A.2d 919
12/07/1988OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - TE PAGE # - 2512
12/28/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD