Case: 04-81-00463-CR
04-81-00463-CR
12/09/1981
Other Felony
Hernandez, Dagoberto
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
07/14/2014 | Case file was destroyed per retention schedule | | |
04/21/1983 | Mandate Executed By The Trial Court | | |
04/20/1983 | Mandate Issued | | |
04/20/1983 | Mandate Issued | | |
02/16/1983 | Opinion issued | Dismissed for Want of Prosecution | |
02/16/1983 | Opinion issued | Dismissed for Want of Prosecution | |
12/09/1981 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
12/09/1981 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
07/14/2014 | Case Stored | Case destroyed |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
No Party. |
Trial Court Information
79th Judicial District Court
Brooks
Honorable James A. Mckay, Jr.
1570
UNKNOWN