judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals

Case: 01-81-00854-CR
01-81-00854-CR
12/09/1981
Burglary
Roberts, Charles Reginald
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/27/1983No description available.Motion or Writ Denied (inactivated by Hebert 2-8-06)
10/24/1983Mandate issued - criminal or civil
10/07/1983No description available.
08/18/1982Brief filed
05/15/1982Motion for rehearing disposedOverruled
04/28/1982Motion for rehearing filed
04/01/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/12/1982Record filed
12/09/1981Notice of appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/24/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StatePRO SE
StateCriminal - State of Texas
StateCriminal - Appellant
Trial Court Information
174th District Court
Harris
344,057
10 years