Case: C-9948
C-9948
06/07/1990
Habeas set to argue
EX PARTE: BERNICE WILSON
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/25/1990 | Letter brief | Respondent | notifying of intention to file a supplemental Statement of Facts | |
09/19/1990 | Letter brief | Respondent's Motion for Rehearing of Cause filed | notifying of intention to file supplement to motion for rehearing | |
07/12/1990 | Motion for Rehearing | Respondent's Motion for Rehearing of Cause filed | BEHALF RONNIE MILLER, SHERIFF, AND REAL PARTY, FIRST CITY, TEXAS - BRYAN, N.A. | |
06/14/1990 | Brief in Support of Petition | Respondent | IN SUPPORT OF C-9948 & C-9949. | |
06/14/1990 | Reply Brief | Respondent | OF RESPONDENT & FIRST CITY, TX-BRYAN N.A. TO PET FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS. | |
06/07/1990 | Exhibits in case/cause filed | Relator | | |
06/07/1990 | Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed | Relator | | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/14/1991 | Bond posted in habeas corpus action returned | | | |
12/14/1990 | Case Stored | Rehearing Overruled | | |
11/14/1990 | Motion for Rehearing - Disposed | Overruled | Rehearing Overruled 797 SW2d 6 | |
10/22/1990 | Addendum to brief filed | Addendum to Motion For Rehearing | | |
10/22/1990 | Statement of facts filed in habeas corpus | 1 volume only | | |
09/25/1990 | Letter brief | notifying of intention to file a supplemental Statement of Facts | | |
09/19/1990 | Letter brief | notifying of intention to file supplement to motion for rehearing | | |
07/12/1990 | Motion for Rehearing | BEHALF RONNIE MILLER, SHERIFF, AND REAL PARTY, FIRST CITY, TEXAS - BRYAN, N.A. | | |
07/12/1990 | Motion for Rehearing forwarded | | | |
07/02/1990 | Court approved judgment sent to attorneys of record | | | |
06/27/1990 | Opinion issued | habeas corpus opinion orders relator discharged | CONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive disposition info. | |
06/27/1990 | Opinion issued | habeas corpus opinion orders relator discharged | PER CURIAM OP. 797 SW2d 6 (COMBINED OPINION WITH C-9949). | |
06/14/1990 | Brief in Support of Petition | IN SUPPORT OF C-9948 & C-9949. | | |
06/14/1990 | No description available. | | | |
06/14/1990 | Reply Brief | OF RESPONDENT & FIRST CITY, TX-BRYAN N.A. TO PET FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS. | | |
06/11/1990 | Bond | FR/SHERIFF RONNIE W. MILLER | | |
06/08/1990 | Letter sent to parties from Supreme Court - See Remarks | CORRECTING CASE NUMBERS IN GRANT LTR | | |
06/07/1990 | Petition for writ of habeas corpus disposed. | Filing granted | CONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive begin date. | |
06/07/1990 | Certificate of Arrest or Restraint. | | | |
06/07/1990 | Exhibits in case/cause filed | | | |
06/07/1990 | Petition for writ of habeas corpus disposed. | Filing granted | WITH $1,000 BOND | |
06/07/1990 | Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed | | | |
06/07/1990 | Request made for reply to proceeding | ON OR BEFORE JUNE 14, 1990. | | |
06/07/1990 | Statement of facts filed in habeas corpus | | | |
06/07/1990 | Transcript filed | | | |
06/07/1990 | Writ of Habeas Corpus issued | | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
12/14/1990 | Case Stored | Case stored. | Rehearing Overruled |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
FIRST CITY, TEXAS-BRYAN, N.A. | Respondent | Mr. Vaughan E. Waters |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information
85th District Court
Brazos
Honorable W. T. McDonald
32,622-85