Case: 00-1209
00-1209
11/22/2000
Petition for Review originally filed as 53.7(f)
LOUIS FOESTER, III and SHIRLEY FOESTER
CALHOUN COUNTY NAVIGATION DISTRICT
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/07/2001 | Motion for Rehearing | Rehearing filed in Petition for Review | on behalf of Louis Foester, III and Shirley Foester | |
12/04/2000 | Appendix Filed | Petitioner | APPENDIX TO PETITION (12) | |
12/04/2000 | Petition for Review | Petitioner | ON BEHALF OF LOUIS FOESTER, III AND SHIRLEY FOESTER | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/25/2001 | Case Stored | G02/20-F-2 | | |
06/11/2001 | Notice sent to Court of Appeals | Final order mailed to the Court of Appeals. | | |
04/12/2001 | Motion for Rehearing - Disposed | Denied | | |
03/07/2001 | Motion for Rehearing | on behalf of Louis Foester, III and Shirley Foester | | |
03/07/2001 | Motion for Rehearing forwarded | record remains in clerk's office | | |
02/15/2001 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing disposed | Filing granted | Petitioners' m/e/t to file mo/re is granted. Mo/re is due March 9, 2001. | |
02/15/2001 | MOTION FOR REHEARING DUE TO BE FILED | Petitioners' mo/re is due March 9, 2001. | | |
02/14/2001 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing | Unopposed m/e/t to file petitioners' mo/re | | |
01/18/2001 | Petition for Review disposed | Denied | | |
12/19/2000 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |
12/13/2000 | Response Waiver filed | On behalf of Calhoun County Navigation District | | |
12/04/2000 | Appendix Filed | APPENDIX TO PETITION (12) | | |
12/04/2000 | Petition for Review | ON BEHALF OF LOUIS FOESTER, III AND SHIRLEY FOESTER | | |
11/29/2000 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposed | Filing granted | Petitioners' m/e/t to file petition was granted until December 4, 2000. Petition is due December 4, 2000. | |
11/29/2000 | Petition due | Petition is due December 4, 2000. | | |
11/28/2000 | Phone call from Clerk's Office | to 13th CA re: motion for rehearing. Motion for rehearing filed 9-6-00 and overruled 9-28-00. | | |
11/22/2000 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed | On behalf of Louis Foester,III and Shirley Foester | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
06/25/2001 | Case Stored | Case stored. | Location G02/20-F-2. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
FOESTER, SHIRLEY | Petitioner | Mr. John D. Murphree |
FOESTER, III, LOUIS | Petitioner | Mr. John D. Murphree |
CALHOUN COUNTY NAVIGATION DIST | Respondent | Mr. Frank Edward Weathered Mr. David Roberts Mr. Lawrence A. Dio Ms. Wanda Buxkemper Roberts |
Court of Appeals Information:
REV'D & DISMISSED WOJ
___ SW3d ___, 08-24-00
13th Court of Appeals
Honorable J. BONNER DORSEY
Trial Court Information
24th District Court
Calhoun
98-6-13403-B