Case Information: 33937 | |||
Short Caption: | WARREN (KEITH) VS. WARDEN C/W 34590 | Court: | Supreme Court |
Consolidated: | 33937*, 34590 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | White Pine Co. - Seventh Judicial District - HC9811023 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 06/22/1999 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/24/1999 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
03/24/1999 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 99-02107 | |
03/30/1999 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. [fn1]--The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court. | 99-02306 | |
06/22/1999 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. | 99-05443 | |
06/22/1999 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
11/21/2000 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. We elect to consolidate these appeals for disposition. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. " . . . we affirm the orders of the district court." fn1[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in these matters, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] NNP00A-MS/DA/ML Nos. 33937, 34590. | 00-20402 | |
12/19/2000 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 00-20743 | |
12/19/2000 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
01/11/2001 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 28, 2000. | 00-20743 |