Case: 97-0807
97-0807
09/09/1997
Petition for Review under Tex. R. App. P. 53.1
THE CITY OF EL PASO
W. E. B. INVESTMENTS DAVID BINGHAM and J. J. WILKINSON
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/11/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
09/25/1997 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
09/09/1997 | Petition for Review | Petitioner | | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/11/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
01/23/1998 | Record returned to Court of Appeals | case stored | | |
10/30/1997 | Petition for Review disposed | Denied | | |
09/30/1997 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |
09/25/1997 | Response to Petition | | | |
09/09/1997 | Notice requesting filing fee | $75.00 fee for petition not paid letter sent to John Gates | | |
09/09/1997 | Petition for Review | | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
01/23/1998 | Case Stored | Case stored. | 29B3 record returned |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
WILKINSON, J. J. | Respondent | Mr. David M. Driscoll |
BINGHAM, DAVID | Respondent | Mr. David M. Driscoll |
THE CITY OF EL PASO | Petitioner | Mr. John D. Gates Mr. Charlie F. McNabb |
W. E. B. INVESTMENTS | Respondent | Mr. David M. Driscoll |
Court of Appeals Information:
08-96-00273-CV
Affirmed/Rev'd & Ren'd
950 SW2d 166, 07-17-97
8th Court of Appeals
Honorable SUSAN LARSEN
Trial Court Information
34th District Court
El Paso
Honorable William E. Moody
95-5328