judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals

Case: 14-81-00824-CR
14-81-00824-CR
12/11/1981
Assault & battery
Vasquez, Johnny
The State of Texas
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/18/1983Mandate Issued
05/19/1983Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
03/14/1983Submission
02/28/1983Case ready to be set
12/03/1982AM CUR, OTHER,
11/04/1982AM CUR, OTHER,
10/28/1982Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
06/07/1982Record Filed (Both records FILED)
12/11/1981Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/18/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of Texas
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppellant
Trial Court Information
209th District Court
Harris
Honorable FRANK WILLIAM PRICE
344,074
18 years