Case: 02-99-00033-CV
02-99-00033-CV
01/25/1999
Miscellaneous civil
Granbury Healthcare Investors, L.P., d/b/a Granbury Care Center; and Granbury Healthcare Investors, L.P., d/b/a Granbury Skilled Nursing and Rehabilitation Center
Bragg, Brenda J.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
04/12/2001 | Mandate Issued | | |
02/01/2001 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
09/15/1999 | Submitted | | |
07/19/1999 | Reply Brief Filed | | |
06/28/1999 | Submission | | |
06/28/1999 | Brief Filed | | |
06/28/1999 | Case ready to be set | | |
06/07/1999 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
06/07/1999 | Other Document Received | | |
06/03/1999 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed | | |
05/14/1999 | Brief Filed | | |
05/07/1999 | Sup. Clerk's Record Filed | | |
04/22/1999 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
04/22/1999 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed | | |
03/30/1999 | Clerk's Record Filed | | |
03/30/1999 | Reporter's Record Filed | | |
03/25/1999 | Other Document Received | | |
03/25/1999 | Other Document Received | | |
03/22/1999 | Other Document Received | | |
02/19/1999 | Request for Extension of Clerk's Record | Motion or Writ Granted | |
02/18/1999 | Received Clerk's Affidavit or Letter | | |
02/11/1999 | Other Document Received | | |
02/09/1999 | Exhibits Filed | | |
02/09/1999 | Reporter's Record Filed | | |
01/25/1999 | Appellant's Notice of Appeal | | |
01/25/1999 | Docketing Statement Filed | | |
01/25/1999 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
04/12/2001 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Granbury Healthcare Investors | Appellant | Mr. Jon Mark Hogg |
Bragg, Brenda J. | Appellee | Greg Fitzgerald |
Trial Court Information
355th District Court
Hood
Honorable Tom Crum
C096284