judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals

Case: 04-81-00468-CV
04-81-00468-CV
12/10/1981
Contract
Handy Andy, Inc.
Rademacher, Kent
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/13/1984Mandate Issued
03/13/1984Mandate Issued
01/25/1984Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/25/1984Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/08/1983Submission
03/08/1983Submission
03/08/1983Submitted
01/18/1983Submission Letter Sent
09/30/1982Requests Oral Argument
09/23/1982Brief Filed
09/23/1982Case ready to be set
08/31/1982Brief Filed
08/02/1982No Description Available.
07/21/1982No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
07/08/1982No Description Available.
01/07/1982No Description Available.
12/23/1981Mot. EOT to file Record DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/23/1981Appeal Bond Filed
12/10/1981Mot. EOT to file Record Filed
12/10/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/28/1981Judgment Signed in Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/13/1984Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
150th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable James A. Mckay, Jr.
80-CI-16117