Case: 04-81-00464-CR
04-81-00464-CR
12/10/1981
Robbery
Edwards, Frank Germain
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
07/14/2014 | Case file was destroyed per retention schedule | | |
11/17/1983 | Mandate Issued | | |
11/17/1983 | Mandate Issued | | |
11/10/1983 | Case Returned from Higher Court | | |
10/05/1983 | Higher Court Decision | Motion or Writ Denied | |
06/06/1983 | Case Forwarded to Higher Court | | |
05/31/1983 | Petition for Review Filed | | |
04/27/1983 | Motion for Rehearing Disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | |
04/27/1983 | Motion for Rehearing Disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | |
03/03/1983 | Motion for Rehearing Filed | | |
03/03/1983 | Motion for Rehearing Filed | | |
02/16/1983 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
02/16/1983 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
01/28/1983 | Motion f/l/file Supp. Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
01/26/1983 | Submission | | |
01/26/1983 | Supplemental Brief Received | | |
01/26/1983 | Motion f/l/file Supp. Brief Filed | | |
01/26/1983 | Submission | | |
01/26/1983 | Submitted | | |
11/15/1982 | Argument Letter Sent | | |
02/10/1982 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
02/03/1982 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed | | |
02/02/1982 | Brief Filed | | |
02/02/1982 | Case ready to be set | | |
02/02/1982 | Case ready to be set | | |
12/31/1981 | Brief Filed | | |
12/10/1981 | Record Approved | | |
12/10/1981 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
07/15/1981 | Record Filed | | |
06/22/1981 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
06/19/1981 | Date of Sentencing in Trial Court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
07/14/2014 | Case Stored | Case destroyed |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
No Party. |
Trial Court Information
144th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Peter Michael Curry
81-CR-0193
Five to Twenty years