Case Heading (S-16-0253) | |||||
Parent: | S-16-0253 | Case Docketed On: | 10/27/2016 | ||
Consolidated: | S-17-0087 | ||||
Status: | Closed | ||||
Original Court: | Sixth Judicial District Campbell County | Case Type: | Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509 | ||
Short Title: | GREGORY DOUGLAS DAVIS v. THE STATE OF WYOMING | ||||
Full Title: | GREGORY DOUGLAS DAVIS, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff). |
- Party Information |
Role | Party Name | Attorney(s) |
Appellant | Gregory Douglas Davis | Diane M. Lozano Eric M. Alden Kirk Allan Morgan |
Appellee | The State of Wyoming | Peter K. Michael David L. Delicath Christyne Marie Martens Samuel Stephen Voyles |
- Case Decision Information | |
Issues: | Criminal Law -Prosecutorial Misconduct, Criminal Law -Sufficiency of Evidence, Trial - Post-trial Motions |
Opinion Number: | 2017 WY 147 |
Citation: | 406 P.3d 1233 |
Docketing Filter View |
Display: |
Docket Information | |||||
Filing Date | Document Description | Docket Entry Type | Docket Entry Subtype | Status | |
10/27/2016 | Event - Docketed and indexed | Event | Docketed and indexed | Final | |
10/27/2016 | Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district court | Notice-Incoming | Record completion notice from district court | Final | |
10/27/2016 | Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letter | Notice-Outgoing | Docketing letter | Final | |
12/09/2016 | Motion - Stay briefing - unopposed | Motion | Stay briefing - unopposed | Final | |
12/12/2016 | Event - Hardcopy received - Appellants Motion to Stay Briefing Schedule and Remand | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
12/20/2016 | Order Granting Motion to Stay Briefing | Order | Granting stay | Final | |
03/24/2017 | Order - Lifting Stay and resuming briefing schedule | Order | Lifting Stay | Final | |
03/24/2017 | Order - Consolidating cases - Consolidated with S-17-0087 | Order | Consolidating cases | Final | |
05/10/2017 | Brief - Appellant | Brief | Appellant | Final | |
05/11/2017 | Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
06/27/2017 | Brief - Appellee | Brief | Appellee | Final | |
06/28/2017 | Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee; and received Designation of Record | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
07/06/2017 | Order - Oral argument scheduled | Order | Oral argument scheduled | Final | |
07/13/2017 | Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting received by Samuel Voyles obo appellee | Notice-Incoming | Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting | Final | |
07/14/2017 | Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting received by Eric M. Alden obo appellant | Notice-Incoming | Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting | Final | |
07/18/2017 | Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal | Notice-Outgoing | Request for transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
07/24/2017 | Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district court | Notice-Incoming | Record transmittal notice from district court | Final | |
07/24/2017 | Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, six volumes. Volumes 1 - 3 - Original Papers; Volumes 4 - 5 - Transcripts(10 total); Volume 6 - Confidential folder | Record | Transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
07/24/2017 | Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filed | Notice-Outgoing | Transmitted record on appeal filed | Final | |
08/17/2017 | Notice-Internal - Oral argument notice, argued before Chief Justice Burke, Justices Hill, Davis, Fox and Kautz (Eric M. Alden o/b/o Appellant; Samuel S. Voyles, o/b/o appellee) and taken under advisement | Notice-Internal | Oral argument notice | Final | |
12/12/2017 | Notice-Incoming - Entry of appearance - Kirk A. Morgan obo Appellant | Notice-Incoming | Entry of appearance | Final | |
12/12/2017 | Motion - Withdrawal of counsel - Tina N. Olson | Motion | Withdrawal of counsel | Final | |
12/13/2017 | Event - Hardcopy received - Entry of Appearance and Motion to Withdraw | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
12/13/2017 | Order - Granting withdrawal of counsel - Tina N. Olson | Order | Granting withdrawal of counsel | Final | |
12/14/2017 | Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming with Chief Justice Burke writing for the court | Opinion | Opinion and journal order | Final | |
01/02/2018 | Notice-Outgoing - Mandate | Notice-Outgoing | Mandate | Final | |
01/02/2018 | Record - Record returned to district court | Record | Record returned to district court | Final | |
01/02/2018 | Notice-Outgoing - Record return letter | Notice-Outgoing | Record return letter | Final | |
01/02/2018 | Event - Case closed | Event | Case closed | Final | |
01/09/2018 | Service - Certified mail signature return card - Received by Rene Ruff 1/4/18 | Service | Certified mail signature return card | Final |