Case: 03-01-00030-CV
03-01-00030-CV
01/29/2001
Child custody/adoption/termination
Robin Cash Lumbis
Texas Department of Protective and Regulatory Services
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
11/15/2012 | Case file was destroyed per retention schedule | | |||||
01/31/2005 | Case stored | | |||||
09/12/2002 | Mandate Issued | | |||||
07/18/2002 | Motion for Rehearing Disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | | ||||
06/12/2002 | Motion for rehearing filed | | |||||
05/30/2002 | Petition for review disposed in Supreme Court | Motion or Writ Denied | | ||||
04/18/2002 | Correction filed | | |||||
03/28/2002 | Petition for review filed in the Supreme Court | | |||||
02/22/2002 | Motion for Rehearing Disposed | Overruled | | ||||
02/08/2002 | Certificate of conference filed | | |||||
01/30/2002 | Certificate of conference requested | | |||||
01/29/2002 | Motion for rehearing filed | | |||||
01/29/2002 | Motion for Rehearing Received | | |||||
01/25/2002 | Opinion issued | Affirmed |
| ||||
10/29/2001 | Submitted | | |||||
09/13/2001 | Set for submission on briefs | | |||||
09/06/2001 | Case ready to be set | | |||||
09/06/2001 | Oral argument requested | Overruled | | ||||
08/17/2001 | Record has been checked in-see remarks | | |||||
08/15/2001 | Brief filed | | |||||
07/19/2001 | Record checked out - see remarks | | |||||
07/16/2001 | Brief filed | | |||||
06/21/2001 | Record has been checked in-see remarks | | |||||
05/30/2001 | Record checked out - see remarks | | |||||
05/10/2001 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
05/09/2001 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |||||
04/30/2001 | Reporter's Record Filed | | |||||
04/12/2001 | Reporter's Record Received | | |||||
04/09/2001 | Reporter's Record Filed | | |||||
03/13/2001 | Notice of no Court Reporter's Record Recd or Filed | | |||||
02/15/2001 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |||||
02/15/2001 | Clerk's Record Filed | | |||||
02/13/2001 | Mot - Ext. time file NOA Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
02/08/2001 | Filing fee requested | | |||||
02/08/2001 | Response requested (postcard) | | |||||
02/07/2001 | Response to Motion | | |||||
01/30/2001 | Filing fee requested | | |||||
01/30/2001 | Completed docketing statement requested | | |||||
01/29/2001 | Mot.- Ext. time file NOA | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
09/12/2002 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Lumbis, Joseph Christian | Appellee | |
Lumbis, Robin Cash | Appellant | Mr. Michael C. Shulman |
Lumbis, Alfred P. | Interested party | Mr. John Timothy Whitten |
Texas Department of Protective and Regulatory Services | Appellee | The Honorable Ronald Earle Ms. Leslie L. Strauch |
Lumbis, Anthony Michael | Appellee |
Trial Court Information
126th District Court
Travis
Honorable W. Jeanne Meurer
FM000570